Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82801
Short Caption:IN RE: REINSTATEMENT OF MALIK W. AHMADCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Reinstatement - Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/28/2021How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/23/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Bar Matter/Bar Discipline. (SC).
04/23/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. I of II. (SC).21-11768
04/23/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. II of II. (SC).21-11769
04/23/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. Due date: 30 days. If no opening brief is filed, the matter will be submitted for decision on the record without briefing or oral argument. (SC).21-11772
05/28/2021Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC).
06/25/2021Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order of Reinstatement. "Malik W. Ahmad is hereby reinstated to the practice of law in Nevada." EN BANC. (SC)21-18299
06/28/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Service to the Courts Re: Order of Reinstatement. (SC)21-18505
07/20/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-20789
07/20/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)