Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82802
Short Caption:IN RE: REINSTATEMENT OF DAVID FRANCIS.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Reinstatement - Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/28/2021How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/23/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Bar Matter/Bar Discipline. (SC).
04/23/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol I of II. (SC).21-11773
04/23/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol II of II. (SC).21-11774
04/23/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. Due date: 30 days. If no opening brief is filed, the matter will be submitted for decision on the record without briefing or oral argument. (SC).21-11776
05/28/2021Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC).
07/22/2021Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order of Conditional Reinstatement. "We therefore approve the panel's recommendation that Francis be reinstated to the practice of law." Providing that Francis passes the Nevada bar exam, including the multi-state professional responsibility exam, and meets all other qualifications for admission to the Nevada bar, he shall be reinstated, subject to the above conditions. En Banc. (SC).21-21182
07/26/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice to the Courts No. 82802. (SC)21-21453
08/16/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-23840
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
09/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by Bar Counsel on August 24, 2021. (SC)21-23840