Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 82803
Short Caption:SHAHROKHI VS. DIST. CT. (BURROW)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):78771, 78771-COA, 79336, 79336-COA, 79992, 79992-COA, 80277, 80277-COA, 80447, 80447-COA, 81218, 81218-COA, 81791, 81791-COA, 81978, 81978-COA, 82245, 83164, 83558, 83662
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D581208Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/26/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Petition. (SC)
04/26/2021Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ of Mandamus or in the Alternative, Writ of Prohibition. (SC)21-11870
04/26/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-11872
04/26/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Ali Shahrokhi. Check no. 1003. (SC)
04/26/2021Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Petitioner's Exhibit Appendix in Support of Writ of Mandamus or in the Alternative, Writ of Prohibition. (SC)21-11878
04/28/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Emergency Motion for Stay . (SC)21-12207
05/03/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer and Granting Temporary Stay. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 14 days. Petitioner shall have 7 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. We temporarily stay the underlying district court proceedings pending our receipt and consideration of any opposition to the stay motion and further order of this court. Any opposition to the stay motion is due by May 5, 2021. (SC)21-12539
05/05/2021MotionFiled Real Party in Interest Kizzy Burrow's Response to Petitioner's Emergency Motion to Stay Under NRAP 27(E) Relief Needed Before Judge Stacy Rocheleau Hears a Contested Matter Which Could Possibly Occur Within Two Days of this Stay Being Filed (By April 29, 2027) (2021). (SC)21-12938
05/12/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's "Motion to Disqualify Yvonne Ruiz, Esq., Thomas Standish, Esq., Phillip Spradling, Esq., and Standish Law Firm for Committing Perjury and Bringing Fraud Upon the Court." (SC)21-13688
05/13/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Petitioner's Reply to Respondents' Response as Directed by this Honorable Court. (SC)21-13860
05/17/2021Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ. (SC)21-14213
05/20/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Strike Real Party in Interest 2nd Answer without asking the Court for Permission. (SC)21-14480
06/03/2021MotionFiled Proper Person "Petitioner's Reply to Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ."21-15759
06/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to vacate its decision that concluded that the peremptory challenge was untimely and returned the case to Judge Rocheleau." fn1 [Petitioner's motions to disqualify real party in interest's counsel and to strike her second answer are denied.] fn2 [In light of this order, the alternative request for a writ of prohibition is denied, petitioner's emergency stay motion is denied as moot, and we vacate our May 3 temporary stay.] NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-16532
06/09/2021WritFiled Writ with letter. Certified copy of writ and Order mailed to Hon. Stacy Rocheleau and Vincent Ochoa, District Judges, by this office. (SC)21-16567
06/09/2021WritFiled Writ of Mandamus. Served on Hon. Stacy Rocheleau and Vincent Ochoa, District Judges, by mail from this office on this day. (SC)21-16573
06/28/2021MotionFiled Petitioner's "Bill of Costs Per NRAP Rule 39." (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 06/28/21). (SC)
06/28/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document."Bill of Costs Per NRAP Rule 39." (SC)21-18472
07/02/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Request to Extend Time for Bill of Cost. (SC)21-19111
07/16/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall file the bill of costs pursuant to NRAP 39 received on July 2, 2021. Petitioner is not entitled to any costs under NRAP 39 and the bill of costs is disapproved. (SC)21-20604
07/16/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Bill of Costs Per NRAP Rule 39.21-20606
07/19/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)21-20718
07/19/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)