Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82001-COA
Short Caption:WASHINGTON (SAAIM) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):77826, 77826-COA, 82001
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C287139
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A810164
Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/27/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
07/02/2021OtherReturned Unfiled Document: Appellant's Informal Brief. (COA)21-19134
07/12/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-19907
07/22/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time on the Informal Brief Form, Documents. (COA)21-21250
08/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On July 12, 2021, this court issued an Order of Affirmance, disposing of the instant appeal. See NRAP 34(g). Accordingly appellant's motion for an extension of time to file his informal brief, filed on July 22, 2021, is denied as moot. The clerk shall return, unfiled, the informal brief received on July 22, 2021. (COA)21-22269
08/06/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
08/06/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed (COA)