Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82812
Short Caption:SKAGGS (CHARLES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):78845, 82813
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR182148Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/27/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/27/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-12051
05/11/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeals. "ORDERS these appeals DISMISSED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH. Nos 82812/82813. (SC)21-13454
06/07/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16204
06/07/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 9, 2021. (SC)21-16204