Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82822
Short Caption:VILLAVERDE VS. DANIELSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A819057Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/28/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
04/28/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-12230
04/28/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-12232
05/05/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. (SC)21-12827
05/17/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Response to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-14202
05/17/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice to Stop Potential Dismissal for Failure to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. (SC)21-14205
05/17/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service - Proper Person Appellant's Notice to Stop Potential Dismissal for Failure to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee.. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-14209
05/21/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1 [Appellant's "Notice to Stop Potential Dismissal for Failure to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee" is denied as moot.] NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-14621
06/15/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-17186
06/15/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/02/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 17, 2021. (SC)21-17186