Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82844
Short Caption:BARFIELD (ROBERT) VS. DIRECTORCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 20EW000391BClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/03/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
05/03/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-12634
05/20/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Attorney General to Obtain and Transmit Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal Log or Other Log Maintained by the Prison and Regarding Appellant's Status. Notice of appeal log due: 30 days. In addition, within the same time period, the Attorney General shall also provide appropriate documentation indicating whether appellant has had a parole hearing, been paroled, or has otherwise discharged his sentence. (SC)21-14556
05/26/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Substitution of Attorneys, Allison Herr will be taking over for Trisha Chapman. (SC)21-15162
06/21/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Allison Herr and the Removal of Trisha Chapman. (SC)21-17855
06/21/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-17857
06/25/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-18341
07/20/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-20793
07/20/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 21, 2021. (SC)21-20793