Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82726-COA
Short Caption:VOLPICELLI (FERRILL) VS. THE SECOND JUD. DIST. CT.Court:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):43203, 51622, 61142, 63554, 65212, 70126, 70126-COA, 70646, 70646-COA, 81337, 82369, 82369-COA, 82726, 83042, 83042-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR031263Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/05/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
05/05/2021Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (Exhibits attached). (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 05/05/21). (COA).21-12839
06/07/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-16200
06/18/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-17613
06/30/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Stay the Remittitur. (COA)21-18759
07/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a pro se motion to stay the issuance of the remittitur pending review in this court and the Nevada Supreme Court, and possibly the United States Supreme Court. The motion is premature with respect to any petition for a writ of certorari. Should appellant file a petition for a writ of certiorari in the United States Supreme Court, he may file a motion to stay the issuance of the remittitur at that time. (COA)21-19941
08/19/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (COA)21-24206
09/02/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
09/02/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)