Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81520-COA
Short Caption:WARREN (ALEX) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):81520
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR192742Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/05/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
05/20/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Limited Remand for Designation of Counsel. District Court Order due: 7 days. (SC)21-14525
06/01/2021Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on May 28th, 202.1 Appointing Vicky T. Oldenburg as counsel for appellant. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT) (COA)21-16596
06/11/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall add Victoria T. Oldenburg as counsel for appellant. (COA)21-16834
07/21/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-20977
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)