Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82856
Short Caption:WILLIAMS VS. WYNN LAS VEGAS AND ENCORE HOTELCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):82973, 83295
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A807413Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/05/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC)
05/05/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-12924
05/05/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)21-12926
05/11/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA) (SC)21-13483
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-13910
06/08/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16381
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 9, 2021. (SC)21-16381