Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82858
Short Caption:BIERSTEDT VS. BIERSTEDTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):82474, 82857
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D440918Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Denied
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/14/2021 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/06/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
05/06/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC)
05/06/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-12984
05/06/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-12988
05/13/2021Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Alex B. Ghibaudo. (SC)
05/13/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)21-13800
05/14/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC)21-14011
05/19/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 5/20/21) (SC)
05/20/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC)21-14500
05/27/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Appellant to File Case Appeal Statement. Due: 7 days. (SC)21-15259
05/27/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 16, 2021, at 10:00 AM. (SC)21-15269
06/07/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 06/08/21). (SC)
06/08/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Case Appeal Statement. (SC)21-16351
07/08/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Imposing Conditional Sanction and Directing Appellant to File Documents. To date appellant's counsel, Alex B. Ghibaudo, has failed to timely file the case appeal statement. To date, Mr. Ghibaudo has not filed the docketing statement. Conditional Sanction of $250 due: 14 days; or, Case Appeal Statement and Docketing Statement with a Motion for Extension of Time due: 14 days. (SC)21-19526
07/29/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal and Referring Counsel to the State Bar of Nevada for Investigation. "We dismiss this appeal, and we refer Mr. Ghibaudo to the State Bar of Nevada for investigation." JH/RP/EC (SC)21-22021
07/29/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Reconsider Dismissal of Action and Motion to Extend Time to Comply with July 8, 2021 Order. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 7/29/21)(SC)
07/29/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. (SC)21-22052
07/29/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)21-22060
07/29/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC)21-22064
07/29/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-22107
07/29/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Alex B. Ghibaudo. (SC)
08/02/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Other. The Supreme Court dismissed this appeal on July 29, 2021. (SC)21-22439
08/04/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Donation to Nevada Law Library Pursuant to This Court's July 8th, 2021 Order (Alex B. Ghibaudo). (SC)21-22655
08/10/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Answer due: 14 days. (SC)21-23183
08/23/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-24438
08/30/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). JH/RP/EC (SC)21-25225