Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82859
Short Caption:NUNN (SAMMIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):79219, 79264, 80061, 80121, 80121-COA, 82901
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C336184Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/06/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
05/06/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-12993
05/17/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Stay Appeal. (SC)21-14210
05/17/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service - Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Stay Appeal. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-14212
05/21/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." fn1 [Given this order, this court takes no action on the motion to stay filed on May 17, 2021.] SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-14645
06/15/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-17187
06/15/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/02/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 17, 2021. (SC)21-17187