Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82870
Short Caption:DOWNING VS. DIRECTORCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):83127, 83127-COA, 83362
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A823632Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/07/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
05/07/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-13187
05/07/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-13190
05/27/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has not paid the filing fee or otherwise responded to this court's notice. Accordingly, "this appeal is dismissed." (SC)21-15264
06/21/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-17804
06/21/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/02/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 22, 2021. (SC)21-17804