Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82877
Short Caption:AMOS (TORRENCE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C351639Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/11/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
05/11/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)21-13504
05/12/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/23/20, 12/09/20, 12/14/20, 03/10/21 and 04/26/21. To Court Reporter: Deloris Scott and Dana Tavaglione. (SC)21-13643
05/12/2021Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)21-13647
05/17/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Minutes. (SC)21-14107
05/18/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Withdraw Notice of Appeal. (SC)21-14333
05/26/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Voluntary Dismissal. Appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. Cause appearing, we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)21-15045
06/11/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kristine Santi stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/23/20. (SC)21-16899