Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82885
Short Caption:MIXON (ANTONIO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):70898, 70898-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C277977
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A824271
Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/12/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
05/12/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (C277977) (SC)21-13641
05/12/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (A824271) (SC)21-13642
06/04/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-15993
06/17/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Petition for Rehearing - Motion for Consideration. (SC)21-17522
06/17/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service - Proper Person Appellant's Petition for Rehearing - Motion for Consideration. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-17524
06/28/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Proof of Service by Mailing (Motion for Reconsideration). (SC)21-18496
06/28/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-18513
07/23/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-21275
07/23/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 26, 2021. (SC)21-21275