Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 80490-COA & 80490
Short Caption:JORDAN, II (WALTER) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals & Supreme Court
Related Case(s):80490
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CR-FP-18-6281Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/28/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
01/28/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-03922
01/28/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-03924
02/14/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Order Extending Time to File Request for Transcript. (SC)20-06286
02/14/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/18/19. To Court Reporter: Julie Thuemler. (SC)20-06287
02/14/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion Requesting Filing of Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-06288
02/14/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)20-06290
02/14/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-06292
02/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. Appellant's motions for extensions of time to file the case appeal statement and the transcript request form are granted. The case appeal statement and transcript request form were filed on February 14, 2020. (SC).20-07357
06/29/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Documents. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 14 days. (SC).20-24023
07/03/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time and Partial Remand to the District Court. (SC)20-24656
08/05/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Limited Remand for Appointment of Counsel. The clerk shall remove Gary D. Woodbury as counsel of record for appellant. If appellant is indigent, the district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to appoint counsel for appellant. Otherwise, within 30 days from the date of this order, the district court shall order that appellant must retain counsel and that retained counsel must enter an appearance in the district court on appellant's behalf within 30 days from the date of the district court's order. Within 7 days from the appointment or appearance of counsel, the district court clerk shall transmit to the clerk of this court: (1) a copy of the district court's written or minute order appointing appellate counsel; or (2) a copy of the notice of appearance filed by retained counsel. In light of the limited remand, the briefing schedule in this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. The request for an extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix is denied as moot. (SC)20-28731
09/04/2020Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on Sept. 3rd appointing Shain Manuele Esq. as counsel for appellant. (SC)20-32747
09/16/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Change of Address (SC)20-34158
10/05/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: 90 days. (SC)20-36435
12/21/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: January 19, 2021. (SC)20-46013
01/19/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 1/21/21) (SC)
01/21/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC)21-01805
01/22/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (STRIKEN PER 2/2/21 ORDER). (SC)
01/22/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Joint Appendix Vol.1 (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 1/22/21) (SC)
01/22/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC)21-01941
01/26/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volume 1. (SC)21-02338
01/26/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volume 2. (SC)21-02339
01/26/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volume 3. (SC)21-02340
01/26/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Permission to File Amended Opening Brief. (SC)21-02344
02/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amended opening brief with correct references to the amended appendix filed on January 26, 2021. The clerk shall strike the opening brief filed on January 22, 2021. Respondent shall have 30 days from service of the amended opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)21-03156
02/03/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Amended Opening Brief. (SC)21-03278
03/02/2021AppendixFiled Respondent's Supplemental Appendix - Vol. 1. (SC)21-06109
03/02/2021AppendixFiled Respondent's Supplemental Appendix - Vol. 2. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 3/2/21) (SC)
03/02/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-06111
03/02/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC)21-06130
03/03/2021AppendixFiled Respondent's Supplemental Appendix - Vol. 1. (SC)21-06199
03/03/2021AppendixFiled Respondent's Supplemental Appendix - Vol. 2. (SC)21-06200
04/16/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/13/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-13839
05/13/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
05/13/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
07/21/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-21057
07/21/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)
08/16/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-23740
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
09/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 20, 2021. (SC)21-23740