Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 81697-COA & 81697
Short Caption:GRIMES (BENNETT) VS. WARDENCourt:Court of Appeals & Supreme Court
Related Case(s):62835, 67598, 67741, 74419, 74419-COA, 81042, 81042-COA, 81335, 81531, 81697, 83088, 83088-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A815590, C276163Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/27/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
08/27/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-31721
09/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC)20-33159
09/15/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (A815590). (SC)20-33906
09/15/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (C276163), Vols. 1 -8, via FTP. (SC)20-33943
12/07/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion NRAP 28(G). File for 30 Page Limit Extension for Briefs Prescribed by NRAP 28(G). (SC)20-44358
12/07/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Motion NRAP 28(G) File for 30 Page Limit Extension for Briefs Prescribed by NRAP 28(G). (SC)20-44377
12/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a pro se motion for leave to file a brief that exceeds the page limitation. The motion is denied. (SC)20-44906
12/21/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Certificate of Service by Mailing (Motion NRAP 28(G) File for 30 Page Limit Extension for Briefs Prescribed by NRAP 28(G)). (SC)20-46117
01/08/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to File a Full Brief that Exceeds the 30 Page Limitation of NRAP 32(A)(7)(A)(I). (SC)21-00691
01/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a pro se motion for leave to file a brief in excess of the 30-page limitation. The motion is denied. The clerk shall return the proposed brief received on January 8, 2021, unfiled. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve an opening brief that does not exceed 30 pages or 14,000 words. (SC)21-01990
02/09/2021OtherReturned Unfiled Document - Good Cause for Delay in Filing a Second or Successive NRS Chapter 34 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (SC)21-03907
02/25/2021BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)21-05532
04/13/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
05/14/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-13908
05/14/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
05/14/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
06/17/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-17471
06/17/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
07/08/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
07/08/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
07/08/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)
07/08/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Petition for Review. (SC)21-19648
07/20/2021Post-Judgment Order/DispositionalOrder Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." EN BANC. (SC)21-20825
07/20/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-20834
07/20/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 21, 2021. (SC)21-20834