Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82914
Short Caption:EBY VS. JOHNSTON LAW OFFICE P.C.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):83299
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - 20-CV-01031Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/17/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
05/17/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-14102
05/17/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-14104
05/24/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Stay Appeal. (SC)21-14832
06/04/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has not paid the filing fee. Accordingly, "this appeal is dismissed." fn1[In light of this order, no action will be taken on appellant's motion for stay.] (SC)21-16092
06/29/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-18624
06/29/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 1, 2021. (SC)21-18624