Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82919
Short Caption:SHOEMAKER (TAWNEY) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C349312Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/17/2021Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
05/17/2021Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)21-14164
05/17/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. (SC)21-14166
06/23/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplementation of Appendix. Petitioner should obtain from the district court any subsequent order with written findings and file and serve a supplemental appendix containing a copy of the order and all other materials that are essential to understanding the petition, within 14 days from the date of this order. (SC)21-18090
06/28/2021MotionFiled Appellant's (Petitioner's) Response to Order Directing Supplementation of Appendix. (SC)21-18499
07/30/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." JH/RP/EC (SC)21-22165
08/24/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)21-24690
08/24/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)