Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 82937
Short Caption:EWING VS. EWINGCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D377320Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/19/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
05/19/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC)
05/19/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-14456
06/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has not paid the filing fee or otherwise responded to this court's notice. Accordingly, "this appeal is dismissed." (SC)21-17338
07/12/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19987
07/12/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 13, 2021. (SC)21-19987