Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 81236-COA & 81236
Short Caption:COLLETTI (TRAVIS) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals & Supreme Court
Related Case(s):81236
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C344395Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/28/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
05/28/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-20139
06/08/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/12/19, 1/14/20, 1/16/20, 1/21/20, 3/3/20, 4/21/20 To Court Reporter: Yvette Sison. (SC)20-21416
06/28/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement (REJECTED PER 6/29/20 NOTICE). (SC)
06/29/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-23949
06/29/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Docketing Statement. (SC)20-24083
07/01/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: July 20, 2020. (SC).20-24412
07/20/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement Criminal Appeal. (SC)20-26454
07/31/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Yvette G. Sison stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/12/19, 1/14/20, 1/16/20, 1/24/20, 2/18/20, 3/3/20, and 4/21/20. (SC)20-27950
09/22/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Substitution of Counsel. (Rochelle A. Harding in place of Megan Walls) (SC)20-34876
09/23/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 9, 2020. (SC)20-34957
10/09/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-37133
10/13/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion of Withdraw as Counsel of Record. (SC)20-37641
10/13/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Amended Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. (SC)20-37646
10/22/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions to Withdraw and Remanding for Designation of Counsel. The clerk shall remove attorneys Peter Isso and Rochelle Harding-Roed, and Isso & Associates Law Firm, PLLC, as counsel of record for appellant in this appeal. This appeal is remanded for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. Notice of appearance due: 35 days. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is denied as moot. (SC)20-38724
11/05/2020Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on 11/3/20 appointing Waleed Zaman as counsel for appellant. (SC)20-40273
11/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. The clerk of this court shall add Waleed Zaman as counsel of record for appellant in this appeal. Appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. fn1[Should newly appointed counsel require the production of additional transcripts, counsel shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a request for the necessary transcripts pursuant to NRAP 9(a).] (SC)20-42876
02/08/2021MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Withdraw Appeal. (SC)21-03736
02/10/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Vacate Motion to Withdraw Appeal. (SC)21-04011
02/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion to vacate his previously filed motion to withdraw appeal. The motion is granted to the following extent. This court will take no action on appellant's February 8, 2021, motion to withdraw appeal. (SC)21-04321
02/22/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)21-05237
02/23/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief due: March 8, 2021. (SC)21-05263
03/08/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)21-06750
03/08/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1 (SC)21-06751
03/25/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report. (SC)21-08634
03/29/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report. Due: 14 days. (SC)21-08819
04/06/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (John T. Niman, Deputy District Attorney as counsel for Respondent). (SC)21-09932
04/06/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-09933
04/06/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report. (SC)21-09934
04/08/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. (SEALED) Presentence Investigation Report. (SC)
04/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondent has filed a motion to direct the clerk of the district court to transmit the presentence investigation report (PSI) to this court. As the PSI has already been transmitted to this court, the motion is denied as moot. (SC)21-10359
05/10/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC)21-13283
05/14/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-13959
05/17/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. The reply brief was filed on May 14, 2021. (SC)21-14172
05/17/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/25/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-14893
05/25/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
05/25/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
06/28/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-18523
06/28/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
07/23/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA).
07/23/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC).
07/23/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA).
07/23/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-21279
07/23/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 26, 2021. (SC)21-21279