Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82604-COA
Short Caption:ESTES (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):82604
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A801825, C320096Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/25/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
06/10/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Appointment of Appellate Counsel. (COA)21-16714
06/21/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion requesting the appointment of appellate counsel. The motion is denied. (COA)21-17772
06/30/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion Request for Rehearing. (COA)21-18857
07/09/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for reconsideration of this court's order denying his motion for the appointment of appellate counsel. The motion for reconsideration is denied. (COA)21-19860
07/12/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-19903
08/06/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court (COA)
08/06/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed (COA)