Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82981
Short Caption:WILSON (ROBERT) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Mineral Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - 21CV-WR1-2021-0052Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/03/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
06/03/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-15736
06/11/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-16801
07/06/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19251
07/06/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 16, 2021. (SC)21-19251