Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83000
Short Caption:HARVEY VS. TEGANOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A787578Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/04/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
06/04/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-16044
06/04/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-16046
06/04/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-16048
06/18/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-17577
06/22/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellants have not paid the filing fee, filed the case appeal statement, or otherwise responded to this court's notices. Accordingly, "This appeal is dismissed." fn1 [In light of this order, respondents' motion to dismiss appeal is denied as moot.] (SC)21-17887
07/15/2021Filing FeeReturned Filing Fee. Check No. 1915 returned to Essential Legal Services. (SC)
07/19/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-20691
07/19/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 21, 2021. (SC)21-20691