Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83002
Short Caption:HENDERSON VS. AVILA MONTALVANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A778334Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/11/2021 / Kuzemka, KristineSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/04/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Deaver & Crafton. Check no. 45253. (SC)
06/04/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)21-16097
06/04/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)21-16100
06/11/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kristine M. Kuzemka. (SC)21-16838
06/28/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-18545
07/02/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. The premediation conference has not been conducted because settlement judge was notified by counsel that parties have reached a resolution of this matter. Plaintiff's counsel will be filing a notice with the Supreme Court to dismiss the appeal. (SC)21-19115
07/06/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Stipulation/Motion to Dismiss. Stipulation or Motion to Dismiss Due: 30 days. (SC)21-19196
07/06/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. (SC)21-19316
07/08/2021Settlement Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal/VoluntarySettlement. Pursuant to appellant's notice of withdrawal of appeal which is construed as a motion for voluntary dismissal, the motion is granted and "this appeal is dismissed." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)21-19577