Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83005
Short Caption:WARD VS. VILLAFLOR (CHILD CUSTODY)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):81210, 81210-COA, 81234, 81235
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D588774Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/04/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC)
06/04/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-16123
06/04/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Amended) (SC)21-16125
06/04/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines/Fast Track Child Custody. (SC)21-16133
06/04/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Confidential Cover Sheet. (SEALED) (SC)
06/04/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Confidential Cover Sheet. (SEALED) (SC)
06/18/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-17574
07/01/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Rehearing. (SC)21-18965
07/09/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC)21-19832
08/03/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-22491
08/03/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/20/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 4, 2021. (SC)21-22491