Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83015
Short Caption:HOWELL (DAVID) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - 27CV-WR1-2019-0085Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/08/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
06/08/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-16310
06/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Attorney General to Obtain and Transmit Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal Log or Other Log Maintained by the Prison. Due: 30 days. (SC)21-17953
06/30/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appeal Log. (SC)21-18814
07/13/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. This court "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-20148
08/09/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-23046
08/09/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)