Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83018
Short Caption:SURRELL, SR. (ALVON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):74111, 77148, 77148-COA, 79303, 79303-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR161245Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/08/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
06/08/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-16343
06/08/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Minutes. (SEALED) (SC)
06/25/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-18343
07/20/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-20811
07/20/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 22, 2021. (SC)21-20811