Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83038
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO K.M.W.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - J347858Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/10/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
06/10/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC)
06/10/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)
06/24/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Exhibits List (SEALED). (SC)
07/02/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has not paid the filing fee or otherwise responded to this court's notice. Accordingly, "this appeal is dismissed." (SC)21-19087
07/09/2021Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Letter Regarding Filing Fee. (SC)
07/27/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Reinstating Appeal. On July 2, 2021, this appeal was dismissed by way of a clerk's order for failure to pay the filing fee. On July 9, 2021, appellant filed a letter. The letter is construed as a motion for reconsideration, and the motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall reinstate this appeal. Appellant shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court and to file a file-stamped copy of the motion in this court. (SC)
08/25/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has not complied with this court's July 27, 2021, order or paid the filing fee. This appeal is dismissed. (SC)