Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82962-COA
Short Caption:HAYES (JAMES) VS DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):73436, 73436-COA, 75173, 75173-COA, 77151, 78590, 78590-COA, 78622, 80222, 80222-COA, 81076, 82734, 82734-COA, 82962, 83151, 83274
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C315718Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/14/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA)
06/14/2021Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Emergency Petition for Writ of Prohibition. (TRANSFERED FROM SC ON 6/14/21.) (COA)21-17054
06/25/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-18398
06/28/2021Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Letter, a Question is Reviewed De Novo. (COA)21-18589
07/07/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-19438
08/19/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (COA)21-24203
09/14/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
09/14/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)