Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83071
Short Caption:SEIBEL VS. DIST. CT. (DESERT PALACE, INC.)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):82448
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A751759Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/16/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from John R. Bailey. (SC)
06/16/2021Petition/WritFiled Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief - Redacted. (SC)21-17402
06/16/2021MotionFiled Petitioners' Emergency Motion for a Stay of Compliance with the District Court's Order Compelling Production of Attorney-Client Privileged Documents. (SC)21-17403
06/16/2021MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion to Redact Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief and to Seal Volumes 6 to 16 of the Appendix Thereto. (SC)21-17404
06/16/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC)21-17405
06/16/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC)21-17407
06/16/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (SC)21-17409
06/16/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4. (SC)21-17410
06/16/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. (SC)21-17411
06/17/2021MotionFiled Real Parties in Interest's Response to Petitioners' Emergency Motion for a Stay of Compliance with the District Court's Order Compelling Production of Attorney-Client Privileged Documents. (SC)21-17483
06/17/2021MotionFiled Petitioners' Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for a Stay of Compliance with the District Court's Order Compelling Production of Attorney-Client Privileged Documents. (SC)21-17544
06/18/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1 [Petitioner's motion to file a redacted writ petition and several volumes of the appendix under seal is granted, as the information contained therein was sealed below. SRCR 3(4)(b), 7. The clerk of this court shall file, under seal, the writ petition and volumes 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14A, 14B, 15, and 16, all of which were provisionally received in this court on June 17, 2021.] fn2 [In light of this order, petitioner's motion for a stay is denied as moot.] NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-17582
06/18/2021Petition/WritFiled Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief - Un-Redacted. (SEALED). (SC)
06/18/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - (SEALED) Volumes 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14A, 14 B, 15, and 16. (SC)
07/13/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)21-20075
07/13/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)