Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83088
Short Caption:GRIMES (BENNETT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):62835, 67598, 67741, 74419, 74419-COA, 81042, 81042-COA, 81335, 81531, 81697, 81697-COA, 83088-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C276163Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/24/2021How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/22/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
06/22/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-17896
06/25/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)21-18382
07/08/2021BriefFiled Proper Person Informal Brief. (SC)21-19632
07/14/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Via FTP (C-11-276163-1) Vols. 1-9. (SC)21-20286
07/19/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (SEALED) pages 1-16 and 1862-1893. (SC)
07/19/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (SEALED) pages 244-253. (SC)
08/23/2021BriefFiled Proper Person Informal Brief. (SC)21-24585
08/24/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
09/16/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-26850
09/16/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
10/13/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)