Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83095
Short Caption:MIKHALSKY (FELIX) VS. CITY OF N. LAS VEGASCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C353518Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/22/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
06/22/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-17999
07/02/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." JH/RP/LS (SC)21-19048
07/27/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-21662
07/27/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 28, 2021. (SC)21-21662