Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83097
Short Caption:AMIEVA VS. PEEK BROS. CONSTR. CO.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 19TRT000291BClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/23/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
06/23/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-18071
06/23/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-18073
06/29/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Timothy Callahan. Check no. 1053. (SC)
06/30/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)21-18770
07/01/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries. (SC)21-19012
07/13/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-20149
07/15/2021Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Letter Regarding Case. (SC)21-20485
07/16/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court dismissed this appeal on July 13, 2021. Accordingly, no action will be taken on appellant's pro se motion, filed on July 15, 2021. (SC)21-20568
07/23/2021OtherReturned Unfiled Document - Proper Person Motion for Extending Time-NRAP 26(b)(1)(B) of 14 days. (SC)21-21319
08/09/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-23070
08/09/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/20/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 11, 2021. (SC)21-23070