Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83142
Short Caption:SATICOY BAY LLC SER. 10250 SUN DUSK LN VS. SUNSET MESA CMTY. ASS'NCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A751383Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Settlement Notice Issued/Briefing Suspended
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/11/2021 / Turner, WilliamSP Status:Pending
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/01/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
07/01/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-18972
07/01/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-18974
07/20/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has not paid the filing fee or otherwise responded to this court's notice. Accordingly, "this appeal is dismissed." (SC)21-20860
07/21/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-20950
07/21/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Roger P. Croteau. (SC)
08/10/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Reconsideration and Reinstating Appeal. On July 20, 2021, this court dismissed appellant's appeal by way of a clerk's order for failure to pay the filing fee. On July 21, 2021, appellant filed a petition for rehearing and paid the rehearing fee. The petition for rehearing is construed as a motion for reconsideration, see NRAP 27(c)(3)(A), and the motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall deposit the $250 filing fee submitted by appellant and reinstate this appeal. fn1 [Because no fee is due for a motion filed pursuant to NRAP 27(c)(3)(A), the clerk of this court shall refund the $150 rehearing fee.] (SC)21-23188
08/10/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Roger P. Croteau & Associates. Check no. 23261. (SC)
08/10/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)21-23244
08/11/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William C. Turner. (SC)21-23311
08/24/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)21-24663
09/17/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. (SC)21-27021