Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83170
Short Caption:LONGSTREET, SR. (ANTHONY) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):81621
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C348182Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/08/2021Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
07/08/2021Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (Exhibit attached) (SC)21-19543
07/08/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice of Filing. (SC)21-19545
07/08/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (SC)21-19548
07/08/2021Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. (Appendix attached) (Second Petition) (SC)21-19556
07/08/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice of Filing. (For Second Petition). (SC)21-19557
07/08/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (For Second Petition) (SC)21-19559
07/08/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-19564
07/22/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Proof of Service. (SC)21-21192
07/26/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice of Change of Address. (SC)21-21571
07/30/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition and amended petition DENIED." fn2 [Given our disposition, we take no action on petitioner's motions to proceed in forma pauperis. However, we note that the filing fee was waived upon the docketing of this writ petition.] JH/RP/EC (SC)21-22183
08/24/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)21-24705
08/24/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
09/03/2021OtherReturned Unfiled Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-25680