Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83171
Short Caption:HOLMES VS. 24-7MOTORCOACH.COMCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A832569Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/08/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
07/08/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-19614
07/08/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-19616
07/22/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice Regarding Filing Fee. (SC)21-21236
07/29/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." JH/RP/EC (SC)21-21980
08/23/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-24453
08/23/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
09/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 24, 2021. (SC)21-24453