Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83219
Short Caption:CLARK (WILLIAM) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):82996
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C349044Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/15/2021Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
07/15/2021Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Motion for Extraordinary Writ. (Exhibits attached) (SC)21-20491
07/15/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Extended Compliance/Pages. (SC)21-20492
07/30/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Extraordinary Relief. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1 [Petitioner also filed a motion to exceed the page and/or word limit. The motion is granted in this instance; the petition was filed on July 15, 2021.] JH/RP/EC (SC)21-22185
08/24/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)21-24711
08/26/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/27/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice Change of Address. (SC)21-25075