Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83403
Short Caption:OLYMPIA COMPANIES, LLC VS. KOSOR, JR.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):75669
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A765257Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Settlement Notice Issued/Briefing Suspended
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/03/2021 / Nitz, DanaSP Status:Pending
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/20/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
08/20/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-24378
08/20/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-24380
08/25/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Kemp Jones. Check no. 77407. (SC)
08/25/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC)21-24795
09/03/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Dana Jonathon Nitz. (SC)21-25728
09/15/2021Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)21-26751
10/05/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 25, 2021, at 1:00 PM. (SC)21-28508