Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 35319
Short Caption:NASBY (BRENDAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):47130, 58579, 67476, 67580, 67704, 68039, 70626, 70626-COA, 73412, 73412-COA, 80443, 80443-COA, 81484, 81484-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C154293Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:11/16/2000 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:11/16/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/20/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/20/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant).99-12895
12/27/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 10/11/99 - 10/19/99 Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Patsy Smith.99-13136
12/29/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.99-13335
01/31/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. 10/11/99 through 10/15/99. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio.00-01529
01/31/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. 10/18/99 and 10/19/99 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Patsy K. Smith.00-01530
04/17/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 4/13/00.00-06093
04/17/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.00-06094
05/18/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: May 24, 2000.00-08331
05/23/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark.00-08587
05/23/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief.00-08588
06/07/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 6/5/00.00-09606
10/09/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on November 16, 2000 at 11:00 a.m. in Las Vegas. (SNP00A-1 - CY/RR/NB)
11/02/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
11/16/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP00A-WM/RR/NB.
02/07/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. " . . . we affirm the judgment of conviction." SNP00A-1-WM/RR/NB01-02464
03/06/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur.01-02583
03/06/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/22/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 14, 2001.01-02583