The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 59322
Short Caption:MILLER VS. DIST. CT. (GUY) (BALLOT ISSUE)Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 11OC000421BCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:11/14/2011 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

11-32873: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/03/2011Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality.
10/03/2011Petition/WritFiled Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus.11-30130
10/04/2011AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Volumes 1-3. (CD included).11-30134
10/04/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to NRAP 27(e) Certificate for Emergency Writ of Mandamus.11-30211
10/05/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplemental Briefing and Answer. Secretary of State's Supplement to Petition due: Friday, October 14, 2011, by 4p.m. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: Monday, October 24, 2011, by 4p.m. Any Reply from the Secretary due: Thursday, November 3, 2011, by 4p.m. No extensions of time to the briefing schedule will be granted. Trial Court Record due: Thursday, October 6, 2011, by 4p.m. We direct the clerk of this court to schedule oral argument before the en banc court on November 14, 2011, at 1:30 p.m. in Carson City. The argument shall be limited to 60 minutes. fn1[All documents shall be filed personally, electronically, or by facsimile transmission with the clerk in Carson City. Service must likewise be performed by one of these three methods.]11-30459
10/05/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for November 14, 2011, at 1:30 p.m. in Carson City for 60 minutes before the En Banc Court.11-30466
10/06/2011MotionFiled Emergency Petition/Motion To Compel Pursuant To NRAP 27(e) Action Required By October 12, 2011.11-30533
10/06/2011MotionFiled Emergency Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings.11-30635
10/06/2011MotionFiled Petitioner's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Limited Stay of District Court Proceedings.11-30645
10/06/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Supplement to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings.11-30664
10/06/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 1.11-31217
10/06/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 2.11-31224
10/06/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 3.11-31226
10/06/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 4.11-31228
10/06/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 5.11-31229
10/06/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 6.11-31230
10/06/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries.11-30667
10/06/2011MotionFiled Motion for an Extension of Time to File Transcripts. (Submitted by District Court Clerk.)11-30668
10/06/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Emergency Motion to Compel.11-30670
10/07/2011MotionFiled Real Properties in Interest's Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Motion to Stay (Real Properties in Interest's Opposition to Motion to Stay attached as an exhibit).11-30689
10/07/2011MotionReceived Real Property in Interest's Opposition to Motion to Stay (via E-Flex). (FILED PER ORDER 10/07/2011).
10/07/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Real Party in Interest Alex Garza's Joinder in Opposition and Supplemental Opposition to Emergency Motions for Stay.11-30740
10/07/2011MotionReceived Real Parties in Interest Ken King, Sancy King, Allen Rosnoff, B. Estela Moser Vaden, and the Nevada Republican Party's Supplement to Opposition to Petitioner and Real Parties Dora J. Guy, Leonel Murrieta-Serna, Edith Lou Byrd, Samantha Steelman's Motions to Stay. (R'cvd. via E-flex). (FILED PER ORDER 10/07/2011).
10/07/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motions to Stay. fn1[We grant the First Judicial District Court Clerk's Office's motion, filed on October 6, 2011, for an extension of time until October 11, 2011, to file hearing transcripts. Additionally, we grant the October 7, 2011, motion for leave to file an opposition, and therefore direct the clerk of this court to file the oppositions provisionally received on October 7, 2011.]11-30798
10/07/2011MotionFiled Real Property in Interest's Opposition to Motion to Stay.11-30804
10/07/2011MotionFiled Supplement to Opposition to Motions to Stay.11-30806
10/11/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (Supplemental). Part 1.11-31165
10/11/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (Supplemental - cont.) Part 2.11-31172
10/11/2011TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 12, 2011. Court Reporter: Michel Loomis.11-31208
10/11/2011TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: September 21, 2011. Court Reporter: Michel Loomis.11-31209
10/14/2011BriefFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Brief in Response to October 5, 2011 Order.11-31826
10/14/2011Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 10/14/11. Order Disclosing Special Masters' Report and Redistricting Maps and Amending Order Issued by the Court on September 21, 2011.11-31827
10/17/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Plaintiffs' Submission of Materials Provided at Special Masters Hearing October 10-11, 2011.11-32056
10/18/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.11-32167
10/19/2011BriefFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Brief And Answer To The Court's October 5, 2011 Order.11-32355
10/24/2011BriefFiled Petitioner's Second Supplemental Brief And Answer To The Court's October 5, 2011 Order.11-32836
10/24/2011Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest Alex Garza's Answer to Petitioner's Emergency Writ and Supplemental Brief.11-32843
10/24/2011BriefFiled Response of Real Parties in Interest Dora J. Guy, Leonel Murrieta-Serna, Edith Lou Byrd, and Samantha Steelman to Order Directing Supplemental Briefing and Answer.11-32873
10/24/2011Petition/WritFiled Real Parties in Interest Ken King, Sancy King, Allen Rosoff, B. Estela Moser Vaden, and the Nevada Republican Party's Opposition to Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus Pursuant to NRAP 27(E).11-32874
10/24/2011Other Incoming DocumentFiled copy of district court document. Plaintiff-Intervenors Submission of Materials Provided at Special Masters Hearing October 10-11, 2011.11-32872
10/24/2011Other Incoming DocumentFiled copy of document filed in district court. Petitioner's Supplemental Brief and Answer to the Court's October 5, 2011 filed in district court on 10/21/11.11-32878
10/24/2011Other Incoming DocumentFiled copy of district court document. Final Response to "The Other Parties' Briefs".11-32879
10/25/2011Other Incoming DocumentFiled District Court Document. Plaintiff-Intervenors' Response to the Special Masters' Report and Maps filed in district court on 10/24/2011.11-32904
10/27/2011Other Incoming DocumentFiled Six District Court Documents. 1. Order Adopting and Approving Special Masters' Report and Redistricting Maps as Modified by the Court filed 10/27/2011. 2. Plaintiff-Intervenors' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff-Intervenors' Response to the Special Masters' Report and Maps filed 10/27/2011 3. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff-Intervenors' Response to the Special Masters' Report and Maps filed 10/26/2011. 4. Secretary of State's Objections to Special Masters' Report and Recommendations filed 10/24/2011. 5. Plaintiffs' Response to Specail Masters' Report and Recommendation filed 10/24/2011. 6. Plaintiff-Intervenor Alex Garza's Objections to the Special Masters' Report and Recommendations filed 10/24/2011.11-33288
11/03/2011Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition - Petitioner's Reply Brief.11-33960
11/03/2011MotionFiled Real Parties in Interest Ken King, Sancy King, Allen Rosoff, B. Estela Moser Vaden, and the Nevada Republican Party's Notice of Significant Change in Procedural Posture and Supplement to Opposition to Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus Pursuant to NRAP 27(e).11-34004
11/04/2011MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Non-Opposition to Supplemental Brief Filed by Real Parties in Interest Ken King et. al.11-34080
11/04/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Real Party in Interest Alex Garza's Joinder in Motion to Dismiss Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Non-Opposition to Supplemental Brief Filed by Real Parties in Interest Ken King, et. al.11-34096
11/04/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition DENIED." Fn3[In light of this order, we vacate the oral argument scheduled for November 14, 2011.]11-34124
11/09/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Dismiss as Moot. We deny the November 4, 2011, motion to dismiss as moot.11-34542
11/29/2011RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu/Rehearing11-36535
11/29/2011Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed