The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
13-02023: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62464
Short Caption:STATE VS. DIST. CT. (PRICE)Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus/Prohibition
Related Case(s):60440, 62780
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C267068Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/17/2013Filing FeeFiling fee waived. Criminal.
01/17/2013Petition/WritFiled Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus or In the Alternative Prohibition.13-02021
01/17/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.13-02022
01/17/2013MotionFiled Emergency Motion for Stay Under NRAP 27(e).13-02023
01/18/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer and Granting Motion for Stay. Real party in interest shall have until 5:00 p.m. on January 22, 2013, to file an answer.13-02142
01/23/2013Petition/WritFiled Answer To Emergency Petition For Writ of Mandamus Or In the Alternative Prohibition.13-02359
01/23/2013AppendixFiled Writ Respondent's Appendix.13-02360
01/25/2013Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to vacate its order compelling the State to disclose an oral proffer of the expected testimony of Victoria Edelman." SNP13-MG/MD/NS13-02698
01/25/2013WritIssued Writ with Letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Steven Owens for service upon Judge James M. Bixler.13-02703
02/07/2013WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge James M. Bixler on February 4, 2013.13-04012
02/19/2013RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.13-05140
02/19/2013Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.