The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
13-09839: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62361
Short Caption:GONZALEZ (LEOPOLDO) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus/Prohibition
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C271707Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/02/2013Filing FeeFiling fee waived. Criminal.
01/02/2013Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.13-00007
01/02/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.13-00017
01/03/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. The real party in interest shall have 20 days to file an answer.13-00169
01/23/2013Petition/WritFiled Repondent's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.13-02388
04/04/2013Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Petition for writ of mandamus granted." Before Hardesty/Parraguirre/Cherry. 129 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 22. NNP13.13-09839
04/04/2013WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Michael L. Becker for service upon Judge Michelle Leavitt.13-09866
04/17/2013WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Michelle Leavitt on April 11, 2013.13-11329
04/29/2013RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur13-12379
04/29/2013Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
04/29/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice to update firm name and attorneys in 129 Nev. Advance Opinion 22. (Las Vegas Defense Group)13-12511
09/19/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 54408/58628/62361. (Letter entered in 54408 as document no. 13-27972.)