The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
14-03115: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 59387
Short Caption:GONZALES-ALPIZAR VS. GRIFFITHClassification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Other
Related Case(s):52446, 66954, 67772
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV0700606Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/07/2013 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/07/2013How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/11/2011Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
10/11/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.11-31175
10/11/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.11-31177
10/13/2011Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Office of Richard F. Cornell check no. 14072.
10/13/2011Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Richard Cornell re: paying filing fee.11-31609
10/18/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 15 days. Docketing statement due: 20 days. Opening brief due: 120 days.11-32118
10/21/2011Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.11-32572
10/21/2011Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: September 30, 2010; October 1, 2010 and October 25, 2010. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Reporting.11-32637
10/27/2011Filing FeeFiling fee due for Cross-Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
10/27/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.)11-33163
11/01/2011Filing FeeFiling Fee for Cross-Appeal Paid. $250.00 from Luna Law Firm. Check no. 1271.
11/17/2011Docketing StatementFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.11-35490
12/19/2011TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sunshine Litigation stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: September 30, 2010; October 1, 2010 and October 25, 2010.11-38958
03/14/2012MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appellant's Appendix.12-08203
03/14/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vols 1 thru 6 CD-ROM included.12-08206
03/29/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief, provisionally received in this court on March 14, 2012.12-09905
03/29/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.12-09907
04/30/2012BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal.12-13543
04/30/2012AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.12-13545
05/09/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief and Cross-Respondent's Answering Brief.12-14792
05/30/2012Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/31/2012MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief.12-17071
06/07/2012MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief on Cross Appeal.12-18029
06/08/2012MotionFiled Response to Cross-Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief on Cross Appeal.12-18116
06/19/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief, provisionally received in this court on June 8, 2012. Fn1[In light of this order we deny as unnecessary respondent/cross-appellant's motion for leave to file the reply brief on cross-appeal.]12-19255
06/19/2012BriefFiled Respondent's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal.12-19256
08/23/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Unavailability.12-26679
09/24/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the en banc court on the next available calendar.12-30062
10/05/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for Tuesday, November 6, 2012, @ 10:30 am in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.12-31509
10/08/2012MotionFiled Motion to Postpone and Reset Oral Argument.12-31595
10/15/2012Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The oral argument presently scheduled for November 6, 2012, at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated. This appeal will be scheduled for oral argument before the en banc court on the next available calendar. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.12-32591
11/21/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for Monday, January 7, 2013, @ 11:30 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.12-37028
12/05/2012BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities.12-38251
12/21/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.12-40458
01/07/2013Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
11/12/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, January 7, 2014, at 2:00 p.m. in Carson City, for 30 minutes.13-33710
11/14/2013Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Vacating Oral Argument. This matter was previously argued on January 7, 2013. On November 12, 2013, a new argument notice was erroneously generated for January 7, 2014. The parties shall disregard the notice sent on November 12, 2013, and the argument erroneously set for January 7, 2014, is vacated.13-34353
01/30/2014Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Gibbons/Pickering/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta. 130 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 2. EN BANC14-03115
02/24/2014RemittiturIssued Remittitur.14-05950
02/24/2014Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
03/07/2014RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 27, 2014.14-05950
09/03/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. (Letter dated July 17, 2014) Nos. 58602/59387/63724/64194/56614/58345/62489/62615/57324/59290. (Letter entered in 58602 as document no. 14-29096.)