Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/19/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. | | |
07/19/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 18-27551
|
07/19/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 18-27553
|
07/19/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes (SEALED). | | |
07/23/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Harris & Harris. Check no. 8131. | | |
07/23/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | | 18-28072
|
07/25/2018 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul M. Haire. | | 18-28560
|
08/21/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. | | 18-32395
|
08/28/2018 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 18-33674
|
08/28/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 18, 2018, at 9:30 am. | | 18-33751
|
11/07/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 14, 2018, at 1:00 pm. (SC). | | 18-903320
|
12/06/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC) | | 18-907275
|
12/06/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes (SEALED). (SC) | | |
12/07/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC). | | 18-907558
|
12/10/2018 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC). | | 18-907743
|
12/12/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Elaine Fresch, Eric Freeman and Gil Glancz as counsel for Respondents MGM Grand Hotel, LLC, David Copperfield, and David Copperfield's Disappearing, Inc.) (SC). | | 18-908404
|
12/21/2018 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/13/18, 04/17/18, 04/18/18, 04/24/18, 04/25/18, 04/26/18, 04/27/18, 04/30/18, 05/01/18, 05/02/18, 05/03/18, 05/04/18, 05/08/18, 05/09/18, 05/10/18, 05/11/18, 05/22/18, 05/23/18, 05/24/18, 05/25/18 and 05/29/18. To Court Reporter: Jennifer Gerold and Kristy L. Clark. (SC) | | 18-910009
|
01/15/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Supplemental Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/19/17, 9/18/17, 3/29/18, 4/3/18, 4/11/18, 4/27/18, and 8/23/18. To Court Reporter: Jennifer Gerold, Kristly L. Clark and Kimberly Farkas. (SC) | | 19-02305
|
01/31/2019 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jennifer Gerold stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/13/18, 04/17/18, 04/18/18, 04/24/18, 04/25/18, 04/26/18, 04/30/18, 05/01/18, 05/02/18, 05/03/18, 05/04/18, 05/08/18, 05/09/18, 05/10/18, 05/11/18, 05/22/18, 05/23/18, 05/24/18, 05/25/18, 05/29/18. | | 19-05012
|
02/28/2019 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jennifer Gerold stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/19/17, 9/18/17, 3/29/18, 4/3/18, 4/11/18. (SC) | | 19-09168
|
03/08/2019 | Motion | Filed Stipulation Re: Deadlines for Filing Appeal Briefs. (SC) | | 19-10454
|
03/28/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 11, 2019; Respondents' Answering Brief due: August 12, 2019; Appellants' Reply Brief due: September 11, 2019. (SC). | | 19-13704
|
06/04/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross-Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (Resp./Cross-Appellant, Copperfield) (SC) | | |
06/04/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (Copperfield) (SC) | | 19-24110
|
06/05/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed SEALED District Court Minutes. (SC) | | |
06/05/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Selman Breitman. Check no. 176653. (Cross-Appeal) (SC) | | |
06/11/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 6/11/19). (SC) | | |
06/11/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Opening Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. | | 19-25330
|
06/11/2019 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volumes 14 - 19. (SC) | | 19-25334
|
06/11/2019 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volumes 20 - 24. (SC) | | 19-25340
|
06/11/2019 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 25. (SC) | | 19-25387
|
06/11/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1, 2, 3, 4, 5-6, 7A, 8A, 9-13 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 06/13/18). (SC) | | |
06/11/2019 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 26. (SC) | | 19-25365
|
06/11/2019 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 27. (SC) | | 19-25366
|
06/11/2019 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 28. (SC) | | 19-25347
|
06/11/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-25356
|
06/13/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Appellant's Appendix Volumes 1, 2, 3, 4, 5-6, 7A, 8A, 9-13). (SC) | | 19-25589
|
06/13/2019 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 1. (SC) | | 19-25628
|
06/13/2019 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 2. (SC) | | 19-25662
|
06/13/2019 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 3. (SC) | | 19-25663
|
06/13/2019 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 4. (SC) | | 19-25664
|
06/13/2019 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 5. (SC) | | 19-25665
|
06/13/2019 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 6. (SC) | | 19-25666
|
06/13/2019 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 7. (SC) | | 19-25667
|
06/13/2019 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 8. (SC) | | 19-25671
|
06/13/2019 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 9. (SC) | | 19-25672
|
06/13/2019 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 10. (SC) | | 19-25673
|
06/13/2019 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 11. (SC) | | 19-25674
|
06/13/2019 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 12. (SC) | | 19-25675
|
06/13/2019 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 13. (SC) | | 19-25676
|
06/13/2019 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 13 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 06/13/19). (SC) | | |
06/13/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Joint Appendix Volume 13). (SC) | | 19-25685
|
08/02/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant). (SC). | | 19-32581
|
08/12/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Daniel F. Polsenberg, Joel D. Henriod, and
Abraham G. Smith of Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP, appearing as
counsel for respondents Team Construction Management, Inc. and
Beachers LV, LLC. | | 19-33823
|
08/12/2019 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Answering Briefs. (SC) | | 19-33829
|
08/12/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents Team Construction Management, Inc. and Beacher's, LV, LLC's, Motion for Extension to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 19-33856
|
08/12/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent Backstage Employment and Referral, Inc.'s Answering Brief. (SC) | | 19-33870
|
08/12/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent MGM Grand Hotel, LLC's Answering Brief on Appeal. (SC) | | 19-33873
|
08/12/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent MGM Grand Hotel, LLC's Answering Brief on Appeal. (DUPLICATE SUBMISSION). | | |
08/12/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent Copperfield's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-33876
|
08/12/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondents David Copperfield and David Copperfield's Disappearing, Inc.'s Answering Brief on Appeal and David Copperfield's Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (STRICKEN PER 11/08/19 ORDER). | | |
08/12/2019 | Appendix | Filed Respondent David Copperfield, and David Copperfield's Disappearing, Inc.'s Joint Appendix. (SC) (STRICKEN PER 11/08/19 ORDER). | | |
08/14/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Opposition to Team Construction's Motion for Extension to File Answering Brief. (SC). | | 19-34182
|
08/29/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this cross-appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Appellants/cross-respondents may file any reply within 14 days from the date that respondent/cross-appellant's response is served. fn1[This court takes no action in regard to the stipulation filed on August 12, 2019. Respondent/cross-appellant David Copperfield and respondents MGM Grand Hotel; Backstage Employment and Referral; and David Copperfield's Disappering, Inc. filed their briefs and appendix on August 12, 2019. The motion for extension of time filed by respondents Team Construction Management and Beachers LV is denied as moot.] (SC) | | 19-36164
|
09/24/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 19-39685
|
09/24/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant David Copperfield aka David S. Kotkin's Notice of Withdrawal of Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 19-39702
|
10/03/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Firm Address ( Harris & Harris Injury Lawyers for Appellants). (SC) | | 19-41085
|
11/08/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Dismissing Cross-Appeal and Reinstating Briefing. Respondent/cross-appellant David Copperfield concedes he is not an aggrieved party and moves for a voluntary dismissal of the cross-appeal. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. "The cross-appeal is dismissed." The clerk of this court shall amend the caption to conform to the caption on this order. The clerk of this court shall strike the combined answering brief and opening brief on cross-appeal and joint appendix filed on August 12, 2019. Respondents David Copperfield; David Copperfield's Disappearing, Inc.; Team Construction Management, Inc.; and Beachers LV, LLC Answering Briefs due: 30 days. (SC). | | 19-45961
|
12/06/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondents David Copperfield and David Copperfield's Disappearing, Inc.'s Answering Brief on Appeal. (SC) | | 19-49479
|
12/06/2019 | Appendix | Filed Respondents David Copperfield, and David Copperfield's Disappearing, Inc.'s Joint Appendix. (SC) | | 19-49483
|
12/09/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent Team Construction Management, Inc.'s Answering Brief. (SC) | | 19-49890
|
01/06/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-00581
|
01/07/2020 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
01/22/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondents MGM, Copperfield and Copperfield's Disappearing's Motion to Supplement Record Pursuant to NRAP 10(B)(2) and 30(D). (SC) | | 20-02953
|
01/30/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Exhibits. District Court's Trial Exhibit 94 and Trial Exhibit 402 due: 28 days. (SC). | | 20-04134
|
02/04/2020 | Motion | Filed Motion to Amend Caption to Remove Beachers LV, LLC as a Respondent. (SC) | | 20-04911
|
02/12/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Caption. Respondent Beachers LV, LLC, has filed a motion to amend the caption and remove it as a respondent in this appeal on the ground that no appellate claims are pending against it. The clerk of this court shall remove Beachers LV, LLC, from the docket as respondent and shall amend the caption to conform to the caption on this order. (SC). | | 20-05816
|
08/11/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this appeal is scheduled for oral argument on September 16, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Within 10 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC) | | 20-29539
|
08/27/2020 | Motion | Filed Joint Motion for Additional Time for Oral Argument. (SC) | | 20-31646
|
09/02/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The time for oral argument is expanded to 42 minutes, allowing 21 minutes per side. (SC) | | 20-32337
|
09/02/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 20-32342
|
09/10/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents David Copperfield aka David S. Kotkin, and David Copperfield's Disappearing, Inc.'s Notice of Writ Regarding Trade Secret. (SC) | | 20-33384
|
09/11/2020 | Other | Justice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal | | |
09/14/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Response. Appellants' Response due: September 15, 2020, no later than 12:00 p.m. fn1[All documents submitted in response to this order shall be filed and served personally, electronically, or by facsimile transmission with the clerk of this court in Carson City.] (SC) | | 20-33728
|
09/14/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Respondents David Copperfield AKA David S. Kotkin, and David Copperfield's Disappearing, Inc.'s. Notice of Writ regarding Trade Secret. (SC) | | 20-33783
|
09/15/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondents filed a notice requesting this court to take measures to protect against disclosure of trade secrets during oral argument of this matter. The oral argument in this matter will not be webcast (live-streamed). Respondents shall have until 5:00 p.m. on September 18, 2020, to notify this court whether they will seek redactions to the oral argument recording prior to the posting of the oral argument on the court's website. (SC). | | 20-33925
|
09/17/2020 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Panel. MG/LS/AS. (SC) | | |
09/18/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents David Copperfield aka David S. Kotkin and David Copperfield's Disappearing, Inc.'s Notice Regarding not Seeking Redactions of Recording of Oral Argument. (SC) | | 20-34492
|
10/08/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Exhibit. The clerk of the district court shall have 15 days from the date of this order to transmit Trial Exhibit 402A to this court. (SC) | | 20-36990
|
04/05/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order of Appointment. The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, is assigned to participate in the decision in this matter in the place of Justice Silver, who is disqualified. (SC) | | 21-09721
|
06/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Exhibits/Recordings. We direct the clerk of the district court to transmit the following exhibit and recordings within 10 days from the date of this order, for filing and consideration with the appendix: Exhibit 526 (sub rosa videos) and certified copies of the JAVS recordings for the trial dates of April 30, 2018, and May 1, 2018. (SC) | | 21-16318
|
06/21/2021 | Exhibit | Filed *** Original Joint Exhibit(s) 526 *** | | |
08/03/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that additional oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter is scheduled for oral argument on September 9, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 40 minutes. (SC) | | 21-22477
|
08/06/2021 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Letter Regarding Additional Oral Argument. (SC) | | 21-22874
|
08/11/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' MGM Grand Hotel, LLC, David Copperfield AKA David S. Kotkin; and David Copperfield's Disappearing, Inc's, Request to Change Date of Oral Argument. (SC) | | 21-23373
|
08/13/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Oral Argument. Respondents have filed an unopposed motion to continue oral argument in this matter. The motion is granted. The oral argument currently scheduled for September 9, 2021, at 11:30 a.m. is vacated. This matter is rescheduled for oral argument on October 4, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. Oral argument shall be limited to a total of 40 minutes. Appellants have filed a letter requesting this court clarify the issues raised in this appeal that are of particular interest at oral argument. As noted in appellants' letter, this case has been transferred to the en banc court. Counsel should be prepared to address all issues raised in this appeal at oral argument. (SC) | | 21-23609
|
09/20/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 21-27169
|
09/21/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This matter is currently scheduled for oral argument on October 4, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. The current status of the Covid-19 pandemic requires counsel to appear remotely for this argument.
The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection.
Within 5 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. (SC) | | 21-27205
|
09/27/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' (MGM Grand Hotel, LLC, David Copperfield, and David Copperfield's Disappearing, Inc) Notice of Attorneys Arguing at Oral Argument. (SC) | | 21-27724
|
10/04/2021 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. 76422. (SC) | | |
04/14/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the court En Banc. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Hardesty/Cadish/Pickering/Herndon/Gibbons. Stiglich, J., with whom Parraguirre, C.J., agrees, dissenting. fn1 [The Honorable Abbi Silver, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter. The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, was appointed to sit in her place. The case was initially argued before a three-justice panel, then transferred and reargued before the en banc court.] 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 27. En Banc. (SC). | | 22-11786
|
04/28/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys. (SC) | | 22-13523
|
04/29/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-13651
|
05/11/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. The clerk of this court shall remove all attorneys from Harris & Harris Injury Lawyers and the Morelli Law Firm from the docket in this appeal. Appellants shall proceed in this appeal pro se. The clerk of this court shall file the petition for rehearing received on May 5, 2022. (SC) | | 22-14958
|
05/11/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Appellants' Petition for Rehearing (Appellant's Informal Brief). (SC) | | 22-14960
|
05/11/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid on Rehearing. $150.00 CASH from appellants Gavin Cox and Minh-Hahn Cox. (SC) | | |
05/16/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Proper Person Informal Motion. (SC) | | 22-15499
|
05/20/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellants have filed a motion requesting that this court order attorney Perry Fallick of The Morelli Law Firm to transmit a video to this court, and for the MGM to provide this court with security video footage. Accordingly, the motion is denied. (SC). | | 22-16133
|
05/23/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Emergency Motion for Stay. (SC) | | 22-16227
|
05/31/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent Team Construction Management, Inc. shall have until June 14, 2022, to file and serve an opposition to the motion for stay filed on May 23, 2022. (SC) | | 22-17142
|
05/31/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents David Copperfield, David Copperfield's Disappearing, Inc., and MGM Grand Hotel, LLC shall have until June 14, 2022, to file and serve a response to the motion for stay filed on May 23, 2022. (SC) | | 22-17162
|
05/31/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent Backstage Employment and Referral, Inc. shall have until June 14, 2022, to file and serve a response to the motion for stay filed on May 23, 2022. (SC) | | 22-17163
|
06/01/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. Appellants have filed a petition for rehearing of this court's April 14, 2022, opinion of affirmance. Having considered the rehearing petition, as well as appellants' May 23, 2022, emergency motion for stay, we deny rehearing and the motion. fn1[Although respondents received telephonic extensions to file responses to the motion, in light of this order, no responses are necessary.] (SC) | | 22-17309
|
06/03/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion Under Rule 60(d)(3) to Vacate a Judgment of the Advanced Opinion and April 14, 2022, Petition for Rehearing, and Motion to Retrieve Evidence from the Lower Court. (SC) | | 22-17756
|
06/10/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents shall have until June 24, 2022, to file and serve their responses to appellants' motion filed on June 3, 2022. (SC) | | 22-18522
|
06/24/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Opposition to Appellant's Informal Motion to Vacate the Judgment Under NRCP 60(d)(3). (SC) | | 22-20148
|
06/27/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion of Urgent Complaint. (SC) | | 22-20193
|
06/30/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's opposition to appellant's informal motion to vacate the judgement due: July 15, 2022. (SC) | | 22-20690
|
07/01/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent Team Construction Management, Inc. shall have until July 19, 2022, to file and serve the response to appellants' motion for urgent complaint. (SC) | | 22-20806
|
07/01/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents David Copperfield, David Copperfield's Disappearing, Inc., and MGM Grand Hotel, LLC shall have until July 19, 2022, to file and serve a response to the motion of urgent complaint filed on June 27, 2022. (SC) | | 22-20903
|
07/05/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents Backstage Employment and Referral, Inc. shall have until July 19, 2022, to file and serve a response to the motion of urgent complaint filed on June 27, 2022 . (SC) | | 22-20936
|
07/06/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motion. Appellants filed a motion to vacate the opinion under Rule 60(d)(3). Respondents filed an opposition, in which they explained that Rule 60 does not apply to appellate proceedings, and appellants filed in reply an "urgent complaint." Appellants' motion to vacate the opinion was improperly filed, and this court takes no action on it or their reply. No further motions requesting such relief may be filed, and the clerk of this court shall issue the remittitur forthwith. (SC) | | 22-21236
|
07/06/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-21237
|
07/06/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
07/06/2022 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. (SC) | | 22-21292
|
07/12/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Notice of Return of Records. (SC) | | 22-23955
|
08/01/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 7, 2022. (SC) | | 22-21237
|
08/01/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Notice of Return of Records. Received by District Court Clerk on July 15, 2022. (SC) | | 22-23955
|
08/01/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Informal Motion Dated August 1, 2023, Request for the Removal of the Remittitur July 2022. (SC). | | 23-24621
|
08/11/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellants have filed a motion to "remove" the remittitur to allow them to present "new evidence" to the court. This court elects to treat the motion as one to recall the remittitur. The motion is therefore denied. The clerk shall return, unfiled, the document entitled "USB Exhibit" received on August 1, 2023. (SC) | | 23-26049
|
08/22/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person's Informal Motion to Request an En Banc Reconsideration to Remove the Remittitur and File a Fraud Upon the Court Motion Based on the New Evidence Previously Submitted. (SC) | | 23-27417
|
09/18/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellants have filed a motion for en banc reconsideration of this court's order entered August 11, 2023, denying their motion to recall the remittitur to allow them to present "new evidence" to the court. En banc reconsideration may be requested when seeking review of a decision of a panel of the Supreme Court. Here, appellants are seeking review of the action of a single justice, not a panel of this court. Thus, their request for en banc reconsideration is inappropriate, and is therefore denied. To the extent that appellants' motion can be construed as seeking reconsideration of this court's August 11, 2023, order entered by a single justice, it is likewise denied. (SC) | | 23-30518
|