Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
20-40108: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82018
Short Caption:KRAUS VS. CEGAVSKECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 20OC001421BClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/03/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC)
11/03/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-40005
11/03/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)20-40020
11/03/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC).20-40021
11/03/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Stay and to Expedite Appeal (Immediate Relief Required - 11/3/2020). (SC)20-40045
11/03/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. I believe that I can be fair and impartial in this case, but I wish to disclose that Phillip Aurbach, Esq., is a member of my Red Rock fall mixed tennis team. (SC)20-40055
11/03/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from The O'Mara Law Firm. Check no. 3094. (SC)
11/03/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Bradley S. Schrager and Daniel Bravo of the law firm of Wolf, Rifkin, Shapiro, Schulman & Rabkin, LLP and John M. Devaney, Esq. of the law firm Perkins Coie, LLP who was granted Pro Hac Vice status below, enter their respective apearances in the above-captioned case as attorneys for respondents). (SC)20-40101
11/03/2020MotionFiled Respondents Nevada Democratic Party and Democratic National Committee's Motion to Exceed Page Limit. (RESPONSE DETACHED AND FILED SEPERATELY PER 11/3/20 ORDER). (SC)20-40102
11/03/2020AppendixFiled Respondents' Appendix - Vol. 1. (SC)20-40103
11/03/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Exceed Page Limit. The Clerk of this court shall detach and file the response. (SC)20-40108
11/03/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Response to Appellants' Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Stay and to Expedite Appeal. (SC)20-40109
11/03/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion for Stay and to Expedite Appeal. Appellants shall have until tomorrow at 4 p.m. to file and serve their transcript request form. Appellants' docketing statement, opening brief, and appendices due: Thursday, November 5, 2020 by 4 p.m. Respondents' answering brief due: Monday, November 9, 2020 by 4 p.m. Appellants have not shown that the NRAP 8(c) factors militate in favor of a stay or injunction, and the request for immediate relief is denied. (SC)20-40110
11/04/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Notice of Appearance of Counsel. Bradley S. Schrager and Daniel Bravo of the law firm of Wolf, Rifkin, Shapiro, Schulman & Rabkin, LLP and John M. Devaney, Esq. of the law firm Perkins Coie, LLP, who was granted pro hac vice status below, Order attached hereto as Exhibit A, enter their respective appearances in the above-captioned case as attorneys for Respondents, Nevada Democratic Party and democratic National Committee in the above-entitled action pursuant to NRAP 46(a)(2).(SC)20-40131
11/04/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/23/20 and 10/28/20. To Court Reporter: Peggy Hoogs. (SC)20-40269
11/05/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Emergency Motion to Extend Time for Briefing Schedule Pending Settlement. (SC)20-40454
11/05/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule Pending Settlement. Appellants have moved to extend the expedited briefing schedule in this case, seeking a 7-day extension of time to file the docketing statement, opening brief, and appendix. The motion for an extension of time is granted. Absent appellants filing a motion to dismiss, appellants' docketing statement, opening brief, and appendix thus are due on or before November 12, 2020. Respondents' answering brief will then be due on or before November 16, 2020. (SC).20-40544
11/10/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Dismiss Appeal Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) to Dismiss Appeal and Return Jurisdiction to the District Court. (SC)20-41143
11/10/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)20-41153
11/10/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "This appeal is hereby dismissed, with this matter immediately remanded to the district court." The parties shall bear their own attorney fees and costs. EN BANC. (SC)20-41186
12/07/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-44249
12/07/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
12/18/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 9, 2020. (SC)20-44249