Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
17-17509: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62009
Short Caption:IN RE: D. T., A MINORCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - J306934/9Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Juvenile
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/20/2017How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/31/2012Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived. Juvenile Matter.
10/31/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.). (SEALED).
11/14/2012Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.12-36163
11/20/2012Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/3/12. To Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub.12-36932
12/18/2012TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Darryl Thomas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/3/12.12-40079
02/20/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to File Opening Brief.13-05352
02/20/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: March 29, 2013.13-05393
03/19/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief. (30 days)13-08261
03/20/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 29, 2013.13-08404
04/29/2013BriefFiled Opening Brief.13-12526
04/29/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.13-12527
05/07/2013MotionFiled Motion Requesting Transmittal of an Exhibit Pursuant to NRAP 30(d).13-13362
05/22/2013MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief.13-15070
05/22/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. (Answering Brief due June 28, 2013)13-15072
05/29/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Directing District Court Clerk to Transmit Exhibit. The district court shall have 30 days to transmit to the clerk of this court the CD ROM included as part of Exhibit A attached to the State's Certification filed in district court on September 25, 2012.13-15765
06/10/2013ExhibitFiled Exhibit (original). Exhibit: A to the Subject Minor's Opposition to the State's Petition to Certify the Subject Minor to Adult Status.
06/26/2013BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.13-18857
07/16/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to File Reply Brief.13-20810
07/16/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief Due August 26, 2013.13-20821
08/26/2013BriefFiled Reply Brief.13-25260
08/27/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
08/17/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Substitution of Attorney. Attorney Daniel E. Westmeyer in no longer employed with the Clark County District Attorney's Office.15-24690
01/20/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting For Decision Without Oral Argument.17-02261
02/10/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the juvenile court AFFIRMED." En Banc.17-04800
02/15/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Publish February 2, 2017 Order of Affirmance.17-05391
05/25/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Publication.17-17508
05/25/2017Opinion/Non-DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 23. EN BANC17-17509
06/19/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-20167
06/19/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/20/2017RemittiturIssued Notice of Return of Records. Original Exhibit "A".17-20468
06/30/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Notice of Return of Record Received by District Court Clerk on June 26, 2017.17-20468
07/14/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 29, 2017.17-20167