Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/16/2023 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
05/16/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal (C370555). (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 23-15383
|
05/16/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-15385
|
05/22/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Sharon G Dickinson as counsel for the Appellant). (SC). | | 23-16064
|
05/22/2023 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 01/10/23. Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins. (SC) | | 23-16092
|
06/08/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Full Briefing. (SC) | | 23-18129
|
06/13/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The parties shall comply with NRAP 28, 28.2, 30, 31 and 32. Appellant shall have until July 10, 2023, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 23-18732
|
07/05/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 23-21396
|
07/06/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 23-21540
|
07/13/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1. (SC) | | 23-22372
|
07/13/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 23-22410
|
07/13/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion Requesting Transmittal of Pre-Sentence Investigation Report. (SC) | | 23-22454
|
07/13/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion Requesting Transmittal of Sealed Documents Filed in Left Side of File. (SC) | | 23-22456
|
07/13/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. American Civil Liberties Union's amicus brief due: August 3, 2023. (SC) | | 23-22485
|
07/18/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for William M. Waters. (SC) | | 23-22855
|
07/18/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Disassociation of Sharon Dickenson and Change of Counsel to William M. Waters. (SC) | | 23-22857
|
07/18/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Re: Counsel. The clerk of this court shall add Waters as appellant's counsel of record and remove Dickinson as counsel of record for appellant. (SC) | | 23-23005
|
07/26/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report. Notwithstanding its untimeliness, appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement is granted. The docketing statement was filed on July 21, 2023. (SC) | | 23-23903
|
07/28/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion asking that this court direct the district court clerk to transmit to the clerk of this court a "Temporary Custody Report" on file in the confidential left side of the district court's file. The motion is denied without prejudice. (SC) | | 23-24313
|
08/02/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Presentence Investigation Report (SEALED). (SC). | | |
08/03/2023 | Motion | Filed Amicus Curiaes' Motion (ACLU of Nevada, Fines and Fees Justice Center, UNLV Misdemeanor Clinic, and Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice) for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Appellant. (PER 8/11/23 DETACHED BRIEF AND APPENDIX AND FILED SEPERTELY) (SC) | | 23-24959
|
08/11/2023 | Brief | Filed ACLU of Nevada Amicus Brief. (SC) | | 23-26091
|
08/11/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The motion of the American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, Fines and Fees Justice Center, the UNLV Misdemeanor Clinic, and Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae in support of appellant is granted. The clerk shall detach the brief from the motion filed on August 3, 2023, and file it separately. (SC) | | 23-26092
|
08/14/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for John Afshar. (SC) | | 23-26186
|
08/14/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File the Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-26187
|
08/15/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's (Ackeem Ramsay) Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix. (SC) | | 23-26577
|
08/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (Ackeem Ramsay) Supplemental Appendix. (SC) | | 23-26578
|
08/21/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until November 13, 2023, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 23-27113
|
08/23/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's unopposed motion for leave to file a supplemental appendix is granted. The supplemental appendix was filed on August 15, 2023. (SC) | | 23-27508
|
08/29/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Notice of Voluntary Disclosure for Justice Bell. (SC) | | 23-28125
|
09/01/2023 | Motion | Filed State's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC). | | 23-28683
|
09/07/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to State's Motion To Dismiss Appeal (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 9/7/2023). (SC) | | |
09/07/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 23-29287
|
09/07/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's for Leave to File Opposition to State's Motion to Dismiss Notice of Appeal in Excess of Ten Page Limitation. (SC) | | 23-29385
|
09/07/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to State's Motion Under NRAP 27(e) To Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 23-29386
|
09/12/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (State of Nevada) Reply to Appellant's Response to State's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 23-29825
|
09/12/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for leave to file an opposition in excess of the page limitation is granted. The opposition was filed on September 7, 2023. (SC) | | 23-29862
|
10/19/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authorities in Support of His Opposition to the State's Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 23-34160
|
11/01/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for leave to file supplemental authorities in support of his opposition to the motion to dismiss is granted. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve supplemental authorities. (SC) | | 23-35540
|
11/01/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority.(SC) | | 23-35574
|
11/09/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File the Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-36511
|
02/12/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Expedite Decision and Briefing Pursuant to Nevada Rule of Appellate Procedure (NRAP) 2. (SC) | | 24-05186
|
02/14/2024 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Expedite Decision and Briefing. (SC) | | 24-05459
|
02/15/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply to State's Opposition to Ramsay's Motion to Expedite Decision and Briefing. (SC) | | 24-05789
|
03/06/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motions. The State moves to dismiss this appeal because Ramsay signed a plea agreement waiving his right to a direct appeal of his conviction. The State also filed a second motion for enlargement of time to file the answering brief. Ramsay then filed a motion to expedite the decision and briefing pursuant to NRAP 2. Because the scope of Ramsay's appeal waiver did not unambiguously include sentencing, the motion to dismiss is denied. The State's second motion for enlargement of time to file the answering brief is granted. NRAP 31(b)(3). The State shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve its answering brief. Ramsay's motion to expedite is granted to the following extent. This court will expedite its decision in this matter to the extent that this court's docket will permit. (SC) | | 24-08021
|
04/05/2024 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 24-12021
|
04/05/2024 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. (SC) | | 24-12024
|
04/12/2024 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Respondent State of by Nevada Resort Association(SC) | Y | 24-12820
|
04/24/2024 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (State) Second Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 24-14354
|
05/01/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to State's Second Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 24-15195
|
05/06/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Stipulation to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 24-15750
|
05/06/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. (SC) | | 24-15785
|
06/05/2024 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 24-19686
|
06/05/2024 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
07/01/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. The State has filed a motion to dismiss. Ramsay opposes the motion. The State did not file a reply. The motion to dismiss is denied. (SC) | | 24-22773
|