Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
22-10921: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83997
Short Caption:KARPENKO VS. DIST. CT. (SCHAERER)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D628088Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/28/2022 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/30/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Marshal S. Willick. (SC)
12/30/2021Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC)21-37159
12/30/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC)21-37161
12/30/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC)21-37162
02/02/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real party in interest's answer due: 28 days. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)22-03575
02/28/2022Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Real party in interest shall have until March 16, 2022, to file and serve the answer to the petition for writ. (SC)22-06457
03/01/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Real Party in Interest's Substitution of Attorneys for Racheal H. Mastel with Kainen Law Group, PLLC. (SC)22-06524
03/09/2022MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Motion to Divert Matter to Supreme Court Settlement Program and to Suspend Briefing. (SC)22-07548
03/16/2022Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 3/17/22) (SC)
03/17/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC)22-08470
03/17/2022Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ. (SC)22-08522
03/17/2022AppendixFiled Party in Interest's Appendix. (SC)22-08528
03/28/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The settlement program administrator shall assign this appeal to the settlement program for participation by petitioner and the real party in interest. (SC)22-09504
03/28/2022Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (SC)22-09543
04/07/2022Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for April 20, 2022, at 8:30 AM. (SC)22-10921
05/20/2022MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion to Dismiss Petition. (SC)22-16162
05/24/2022Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. (SC)22-16539
05/31/2022Settlement Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal/VoluntarySettlement. Pursuant to the settlement conference, petitioner's motion to dismiss and cause appearing, this petition is dismissed." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)22-17143