Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
22-21350: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83596
Short Caption:TORREMORO VS. DIST. CT. (COMPTON)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A777320Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/13/2022How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/08/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Michael P. Lowry. (SC)
10/08/2021Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)21-28925
10/08/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. (SC)21-28926
11/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 28 days. Petitioners shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)21-32588
12/06/2021MotionFiled Real Party in Interest, Lamont Compton's, Motion to Extend the Deadline to File Answer in Regards to Issuance of the Requested Writ. (First Request)(SC)21-34747
12/06/2021MotionFiled Real Party in Interest, Lamont Compton's, Motion to Extend the Deadline to File Answer in Regards to Issuance of the Requested Writ. (First Request)(SC)21-34748
12/10/2021MotionFiled Petitioners' Limited Opposition to Motion to Extend. (SC)21-35287
12/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have until January 12, 2022, to file and serve an answer. (SC)21-35390
01/12/2022Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 1/12/22) (SC)
01/12/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Answer to Petition. Due date: 5 days. (SC)22-01278
01/13/2022AppendixFiled Real Party In Interest's Appendix for Answer to Writ. (SC)22-01367
01/13/2022Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ. (SC)22-01368
01/26/2022Petition/WritFiled Petitioners' Reply to Answer to Petition. (SC)22-02687
01/26/2022AppendixFiled Petitioners' Appendix to Reply to Petition for Writ. (SC)22-02688
05/13/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)22-15227
07/07/2022Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. Author: Herndon, J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 54. SNP22-JH/LS/DH. (SC).22-21350
08/03/2022RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur {SC}22-24271
08/03/2022Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed {SC}